US HB1547 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Udall Park Land Exchange Completion Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of the Interior to convey, without consideration, to the city of Tucson, Arizona, the reversionary interest of the United States in and to an approximately 172.8-acre parcel of land owned by the city for the purpose of unencumbering the title to such land to enable its economic development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Udall Park Land Exchange Completion Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-02 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 401 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2018-02-07SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
2017-10-03SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2017-10-02HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-10-02HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 544). (text: CR H7641)
2017-10-02HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7650-7651)
2017-10-02HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-10-02HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1547.
2017-10-02HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7641-7642)
2017-10-02HouseMr. Thompson (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-08-29HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 200.
2017-08-29HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-280.
2017-07-26HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2017-07-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-07-14HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-03-24HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-03-15HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-03-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB612 (Same As) 2018-05-17 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback