US HB1522 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
United States Cadet Nurse Corps Equity Act - Deems service of a person as a member of the United States Cadet Nurse Corps between July 1, 1943, and December 15, 1945 (qualified service), to be active military service for purposes of all laws administered by the Department of Veterans Affairs. Requires: (1) the Secretary of Defense to issue an honorable discharge to each person whose qualified service warrants one; and (2) the discharge to be issued before the end of the one-year period beginning on the enactment of this Act.Prohibits benefits from being paid to persons as a result of such enactment for any period before the enactment date.
Title
United States Cadet Nurse Corps Equity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Dan Boren [D-OK] | Rep. Rick Boucher [D-VA] |
Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
Rep. Bill Delahunt [D-MA] | Rep. William Delahunt [D-MA] | Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] | Rep. John Hall [D-NY] |
Rep. Baron Hill [D-IN] | Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Rep. James Oberstar [D-MN] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
Rep. Joe Sestak [D-PA] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Zachary Space [D-OH] | Rep. Fortney Stark [D-CA] |
Rep. Lynn Woolsey [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-05-21 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to House Armed Services | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Health personnel
Military medicine
Nursing
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Health personnel
Military medicine
Nursing
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/1522/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr1522/BILLS-111hr1522ih.pdf |