US HB1506 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to ensure that valid generic drugs may enter the market.
Title
FAIR Generics Act Fair And Immediate Release of Generic Drugs Act
Sponsors
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1801 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government information and archives
Health
Intellectual property
Marketing and advertising
Prescription drugs
Government information and archives
Health
Intellectual property
Marketing and advertising
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1506/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1506/BILLS-116hr1506ih.pdf |