US HB1500 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID) to report on the impact of the COVID-19 pandemic on the agency's basic education programs. This report shall include (1) an assessment of the global learning loss that will result from protracted school closures; (2) evaluations of the effectiveness, cost, accessibility, and reach of the most commonly used forms of distance learning in low- and middle-income countries; and (3) a description of the resources needed for the USAID to support continued distance learning, safe school reopenings, remedial and accelerated learning, and reenrollment campaigns.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Global Learning Loss Assessment Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-12SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2021-06-29HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2021-06-29HousePursuant to section 8 of H. Res. 504, and the motion offered by Mr. McGovern, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 1500, as amended; H.R. 2471, as amended; H.R. 3261; H.R. 3283, as amended; and H.R. 3385, as amended; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 186; and H. Res. 402, as amended. (consideration: CR H3258-3262; text: CR H3258)
2021-06-29HousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 504, proceedings on H.R. 1500 are considered vacated.
2021-06-28HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-06-28HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1500.
2021-06-28HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3183-3185; text: CR H3183)
2021-06-28HouseMr. Meeks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2021-03-25HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2021-03-25HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-03-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB552 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR504 (Related) 2021-06-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback