US HB1494 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Historically Black Colleges and Universities (HBCUs) Homeland Security Partnerships Act This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security to issue a strategy to enhance partnerships, including those with a focus on research and development, career opportunities, and acquisitions, with historically black colleges and universities and minority-serving institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historically Black Colleges and Universities (HBCUs) Homeland Security Partnerships Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2020-02-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-02-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H981)
2020-02-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1494.
2020-02-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H981-983)
2020-02-10HouseMs. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2020-02-06HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 316.
2020-02-06HouseCommittee on Small Business discharged.
2020-02-06HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-393, Part I.
2020-01-29HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
2020-01-29HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability Discharged.
2019-03-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
2019-03-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback