US HB1492 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 491.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 491.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prevent methane waste and pollution from oil and gas operations, and for other purposes.
Title
Methane Waste Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 491. |
2022-12-30 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2022-12-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-672, Part I. |
2021-04-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 20. |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-04-28 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2021-03-09 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |