US HB1491 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Santa Ynez Band of Chumash Indians Land Affirmation Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill ratifies and confirms the actions of the Department of the Interior to: (1) take approximately 1,427 acres of land in Santa Barbara County, California, into trust for the benefit of the Santa Ynez Band of Chumash Indians, (2) assume jurisdiction over the appeals relating to the acquisition of this land, and (3) dismiss those appeals. The land is made part of the Santa Ynez Indian Reservation. The bill removes restrictions on the land pursuant to certain state laws. Gaming is prohibited on this land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Santa Ynez Band of Chumash Indians Land Affirmation Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2018-04-25SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
2017-11-29SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
2017-11-28HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-11-28HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9443-9444)
2017-11-28HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1491.
2017-11-28HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9443-9445)
2017-11-28HouseMr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-09-21HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 229.
2017-09-21HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-319.
2017-07-26HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2017-07-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-03-20HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
2017-03-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-03-10HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback