US HB1490 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Small Business Investment Act of 1958 to improve the loan guaranty program, enhance the ability of small manufacturers to access affordable capital, and for other purposes.
Title
504 Modernization and Small Manufacturer Enhancement Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 400 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2021-04-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-04-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 16 (Roll no. 116). (text: 04/14/2021 CR H1769-1770) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1834-1835) |
2021-04-14 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-04-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1490. |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1769-1772) |
2021-04-14 | House | Ms. Davids (KS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2231 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.