US HB1475 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture, beginning on January 1, 2020, to carry out a lottery system for the issuance of permits for the use of boats in the Boundary Waters Canoe Area Wilderness of the Superior National Forest in Minnesota, and make such system available to the public on a recreation website of the federal government.
Title
LOTTERY Act Letting Outdoor Tourism Thrive for Every Recreation Yearly Act
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Government information and archives
Marine and inland water transportation
Minnesota
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Marine and inland water transportation
Minnesota
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1475/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1475/BILLS-116hr1475ih.pdf |