US HB1473 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To provide for a program within the Forest Service to detect, document, monitor, and remediate the environmental damages caused by trespass cultivation on National Forest Lands, and amend the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide, and Rodenticide Act to include criminal penalties for illegal pesticide application on Government property, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Targeting and Offsetting Existing Illegal Contaminants Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Forestry.
2023-03-23HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2023-03-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2023-03-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2023-03-08HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback