US HB1472 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-328.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-328.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Redesignates the Homestead National Monument of America in Nebraska as the Homestead National Historical Park.
Title
To rename the Homestead National Monument of America near Beatrice, Nebraska, as the Homestead National Historical Park.
Sponsors
Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-328. |
2021-01-13 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-01-01 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-31 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-31 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7993) |
2020-12-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2019-11-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9087) |
2019-11-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1472. |
2019-11-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9087-9088) |
2019-11-20 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-11-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 235. |
2019-11-15 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-292. |
2019-09-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-09-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-25 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-05-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-03-05 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2326) |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1910 (Related) 2020-03-04 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Monuments and memorials
Nebraska
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
Land transfers
Monuments and memorials
Nebraska
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history