US HB1469 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-09 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate certain river segments within the York watershed in the State of Maine as components of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

York River Wild and Scenic River Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-09HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2021-04-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2021-03-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2021-03-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB803 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB491 (Related) 2021-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 200.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback