US HB1468 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing America's Children Act This bill authorizes the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to cancel the removal of, and adjust to conditional nonimmigrant for an initial five-year period the status of, an alien who: was younger than 16 years old when he or she initially entered the United States and has been physically present in the United States since January 1, 2012; is a person of good moral character; is not inadmissible or deportable on specified grounds under the Immigration and Nationality Act; has not participated in the persecution of any person on account of race, religion, nationality, membership in a particular social group, or political opinion; has not been convicted of certain offenses under federal or state law; is 18 years or older and has earned a high school diploma, general education development certificate, or high school equivalency diploma in the United States, has been admitted to an institution of higher education, or has a valid work authorization; and has never been under a final order of exclusion, deportation, or removal unless the alien has remained in the United States under color of law after such order's issuance or received the order before attaining the age of 18. An alien applying for relief under this bill shall: (1) register under the Military Selective Service Act if so required, (2) undergo a medical examination, (3) submit biometric and biographic data, and (4) complete security and law enforcement background checks. DHS shall under specified circumstances terminate or extend the conditional nonimmigrant status of an alien who is at least 18 years old. A conditional nonimmigrant may file an application to adjust his or her status to that of an alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence during a specified period. An alien who adjusts to permanent resident status may apply for naturalization upon compliance with all immigration law requirements.
Title
Recognizing America's Children Act
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] |
Rep. Scott Taylor [R-VA] | Rep. John Faso [R-NY] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] |
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence. |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Citizenship and naturalization
Congressional oversight
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Higher education
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military personnel and dependents
User charges and fees
Citizenship and naturalization
Congressional oversight
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Higher education
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military personnel and dependents
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1468/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1468/BILLS-115hr1468ih.pdf |