US HB146 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Eastern Band of Cherokee Historic Lands Reacquisition Act This bill takes specified lands and easements in Monroe County, Tennessee, into trust for the use and benefit of the Eastern Band of Cherokee Indians. These lands include the Sequoyah Museum, the Chota Memorial, the Tanasi Memorial, and land to provide support for these properties and cultural programs. The Tennessee Valley Authority (TVA) maintains its right to carry out river control and development on these lands, including temporarily and intermittently flooding certain lands. The bill specifies the structures that may be constructed with the TVA's consent on certain lands subject to flooding. The TVA must be compensated for lost hydropower capacity from future development of these lands. The bill prohibits the United States from being liable for loss or damage resulting from certain activities, such as the flooding of certain lands. The bill outlines TVA's continuing responsibilities. Gaming on these lands is prohibited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eastern Band of Cherokee Historic Lands Reacquisition Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 383 N: 2 NV: 44 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
2018-04-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-04-16HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 383 - 2 (Roll no. 140). (text: CR H3323-3324)
2018-04-16HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3328)
2018-04-16HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2018-04-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 146.
2018-04-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3323-3325)
2018-04-16HouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-02-27HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 442.
2018-02-27HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-584.
2018-01-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2018-01-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-01-17HouseSubcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
2017-10-04HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
2017-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback