US HB1459 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Democracy Restoration Act of 2015 Declares that the right of a U.S. citizen to vote in any election for federal office shall not be denied or abridged because that individual has been convicted of a criminal offense unless, at the time of the election, such individual is serving a felony sentence in a correctional institution or facility. Provides for enforcement of, and remedies for violations of, this Act. Prohibits this Act from being construed to prohibit a state from enacting any state law that affords the right to vote in any election for federal office on terms less restrictive than those terms established by this Act. Declares that the rights and remedies established by this Act shall be in addition to all other rights and remedies provided by law and shall not supersede, restrict, or limit the application of the Voting Rights Act of 1965 or the National Voter Registration Act of 1993. Sets forth requirements for state and federal notification of individuals of the restoration of their voting rights. Prohibits any state, local government, or other person from receiving or using any federal funds to construct or improve a place of incarceration unless that person has in effect a program to notify each U.S. citizen incarcerated in that person's jurisdiction, upon release from such incarceration, of that individual's rights under this Act.
Title
Democracy Restoration Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-03-19 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E367) |
2015-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB457 (Related) 2015-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB772 (Same As) 2015-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1556 (Related) 2015-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SB1610 (Related) 2015-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4302)
SB772 (Same As) 2015-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1556 (Related) 2015-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SB1610 (Related) 2015-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4302)
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Law enforcement administration and funding
Voting rights
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Law enforcement administration and funding
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1459/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1459/BILLS-114hr1459ih.pdf |