US HB1456 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 114-5)
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 492.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 492.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Peace Corps Act to reauthorize the Peace Corps, better support current and returned volunteers, and for other purposes.
Title
Peace Corps Reauthorization Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-19 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 290 N: 125 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 492. |
2022-09-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 290 - 125 (Roll no. 440). (text: CR H7886-7891) |
2022-09-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7946-7947) |
2022-09-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1456. |
2022-09-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7886-7893) |
2022-09-19 | House | Mr. Malinowski moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-09-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 354. |
2022-09-09 | House | Committee on Education and Labor discharged. |
2022-09-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 117-457, Part I. |
2021-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-01 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E184) |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4188 (Related) 2021-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB4466 (Related) 2022-07-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 459.
SB4466 (Related) 2022-07-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 459.