US HB1453 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 61-32)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ambulatory Surgical Center Quality and Access Act of 2015 Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to require alignment of updates for ambulatory surgical center (ASC) services under a revised prospective payment system (PPS) with updates for hospital outpatient department (OPD) services. Revises requirements for the reporting and applying of quality measure data by ASCs and hospital OPDs. Revises requirements for the composition of the expert outside advisory panel the Secretary of Health and Human Services is required to consult during the annual review of the clinical integrity of the groups and payment weights in the PPS for OPD services. Requires the panel to include suppliers subject to the PPS as well as at least one ASC representative. Requires the Secretary, when excluding from a final rule updating ASC lists a procedure whose inclusion was requested during the public comment period, to cite in the final rule specific criteria based on which the procedure was excluded. Requires the Secretary also to identify the peer reviewed research or the evidence upon which the exclusion is based if certain of those criteria are cited for it. Prohibits the Secretary from using or citing as a criterion or a basis for an exclusion that the procedure can only be reported using a Current Procedural Terminology unlisted surgical procedure code.
Title
Ambulatory Surgical Center Quality and Access Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2071 (Same As) 2015-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Department of Health and Human Services
Health
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Home and outpatient care
Medicare
Surgery and anesthesia
Advisory bodies
Department of Health and Human Services
Health
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Home and outpatient care
Medicare
Surgery and anesthesia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1453/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1453/BILLS-114hr1453ih.pdf |