US HB1437 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Management Directorate of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to (1) develop and disseminate a directive for achieving adequate security over DHS firearms and other sensitive assets across DHS within 120 days after the enactment of this bill, and (2) disseminate a revised version of the Personal Property Asset Management Program Manual that includes requirements for safeguarding DHS firearms and other sensitive assets.
Title
Securing DHS Firearms Act of 2019 Securing Department of Homeland Security Firearms Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3758) |
2019-05-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1437. |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3758-3759) |
2019-05-14 | House | Ms. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-02-28 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E230) |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8791 (Related) 2020-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Firearms and explosives
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Firearms and explosives
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations