US HB1433 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

DHS MORALE Act Department of Homeland Security Morale, Recognition, Learning and Engagement Act of 2019 This bill addresses workforce morale at the Department of Homeland Security (DHS). The bill expands the duties of the Chief Human Capital Officer to address morale, including through leader development and employee engagement, maintaining a catalogue of available employee development opportunities, and issuing a DHS-wide employee engagement action plan. DHS (1) must establish an employee engagement steering committee, and (2) may establish an annual employee award program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS MORALE Act Department of Homeland Security Morale, Recognition, Learning and Engagement Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-04-01HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-04-01HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2927-2928)
2019-04-01HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1433.
2019-04-01HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (considered: CR H2927-2929)
2019-04-01HouseMr. Thompson (MS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-03-28HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 12.
2019-03-28HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-26.
2019-03-13HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback