US HB1425 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Patient Protection and Affordable Care Enhancement Act This bill establishes the Improve Health Insurance Affordability Fund. States must use allocated funds to (1) issue reinsurance payments to health insurers (i.e., reimbursements to protect insurers against exceedingly high claims) for individual health insurance coverage, or (2) provide other assistance to reduce out-of-pocket costs (e.g., copayments, coinsurance, and deductibles) for qualified health plans offered in the individual market. The Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services must distribute funding to states in accordance with a specified methodology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient Protection and Affordable Care Enhancement Act

Sponsors

Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]

Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - On passage RC# 124 (Y: 234 N: 179 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 123 (Y: 187 N: 223 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateReceived in the Senate.
2020-06-29HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-06-29HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 179 (Roll no. 124). (text: CR H2599-2614)
2020-06-29HouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 187 - 223 (Roll no. 123).
2020-06-29HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2664-2665)
2020-06-29HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on the motion and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Walden demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further consideration on the motion to recommit until a time to be announced.
2020-06-29HouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
2020-06-29HouseFloor summary: DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Walden motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to prevent the bill from taking effect unless the Secretary of Health and Human Services certifies that no provision of the bill would adversely affect research related to any drug intended to treat or prevent the virus that causes COVID-19.
2020-06-29HouseMr. Walden moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. (text: CR H2642-2643)
2020-06-29HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2020-06-29HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with three hours of debate on H.R. 1425.
2020-06-29HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 1425, H.R. 5332, H.R. 7120, H.R. 7301 and H.J. Res. 90. The resolution provides that the provisions of section 125(c) of the Uruguay Round Agreements Act shall not apply during the remainder of the 116th Congress and the resolution amends H.Res. 967, agreed to on May 15, 2020.
2020-06-29HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1017. (consideration: CR H2599-2644)
2020-06-24HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1017 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1425, H.R. 5332, H.R. 7120, H.R. 7301 and H.J. Res. 90. The resolution provides that the provisions of section 125(c) of the Uruguay Round Agreements Act shall not apply during the remainder of the 116th Congress and the resolution amends H.Res. 967, agreed to on May 15, 2020.
2020-03-09HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 334.
2020-03-09HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-414.
2019-04-04HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 22.
2019-04-03HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-27HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 13 .
2019-03-27HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1884 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1017 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB584 (Related) 2019-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB986 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 90.
HB987 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1385 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 27.
HB1386 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 28.
HB1870 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1879 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4821 (Related) 2019-10-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5291 (Related) 2019-12-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6130 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB6135 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6136 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6149 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6151 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB455 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB585 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1400 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1905 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2218 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback