US HB1425 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State Health Care Premium Reduction Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Health Care Premium Reduction Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 22.
2019-04-03HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-27HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 13 .
2019-03-27HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1884 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback