US HB1424 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the St. Croix National Heritage Area in St. Croix, U.S. Virgin Islands. The bill designates the Virgin Islands State Historic Preservation Office as the local coordinating entity. The preservation office shall prepare and submit a management plan for the heritage area for the protection, enhancement, and interpretation of its resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

St. Croix National Heritage Area Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2021-04-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2021-02-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2021-02-26HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB803 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback