US HB1424 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-6)
Status: Passed on January 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-07 - Became Public Law No: 116-106. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Fallen Warrior Battlefield Cross Memorial Act This bill provides that the Department of Veterans Affairs authorizes the display of a Fallen Soldier Display in any national cemetery. A Fallen Soldier Display is a memorial monument in honor of deceased members of the Armed Forces.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fallen Warrior Battlefield Cross Memorial Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-07SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-106. (TXT | PDF)
2020-01-07SenateSigned by President.
2020-01-06SenatePresented to President.
2019-12-23SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-12-19SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2019-12-19SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7226)
2019-11-13SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-11-12HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-11-12HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8761)
2019-11-12HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1424.
2019-11-12HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8761-8763)
2019-11-12HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-10-29HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-10-29HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-29HouseSubcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Discharged.
2019-10-22HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1545 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback