US HB1422 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 155.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 155.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Private Flood Insurance Market Development Act of 2017 This bill amends the Flood Disaster Protection Act of 1973 to revise requirements for federal and private flood insurance. The bill revises the financial requirements that apply to flood insurance for home loans or loan guarantees by the Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae), the Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Freddie Mac), and other federal mortgage entities. Private flood insurance must meet any financial strength requirements set forth by the Federal Housing Finance Agency. Private flood insurance may include nonadmitted insurers (including surplus lines insurance) as long as the insurer is eligible to provide insurance in the home state of the insured and complies with the laws and regulations of that state. The National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 is amended to direct the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to consider any period during which a property was continuously covered by private flood insurance to be a period of continuous insurance coverage, including for the purposes of National Flood Insurance Program subsidies.
Title
Private Flood Insurance Market Development Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] |
Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 155. |
2017-07-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-220. |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 58 - 0. |
2017-06-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB563 (Same As) 2017-05-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-16.
HB3823 (Related) 2017-09-29 - Became Public Law No: 115-63. (TXT | PDF)
HR538 (Similar To) 2017-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2874 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3823 (Related) 2017-09-29 - Became Public Law No: 115-63. (TXT | PDF)
HR538 (Similar To) 2017-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2874 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
American Samoa
Caribbean area
Disaster relief and insurance
Finance and financial sector
Floods and storm protection
Housing finance and home ownership
Northern Mariana Islands
Puerto Rico
Virgin Islands
Caribbean area
Disaster relief and insurance
Finance and financial sector
Floods and storm protection
Housing finance and home ownership
Northern Mariana Islands
Puerto Rico
Virgin Islands