US HB1420 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 265.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Energy Efficient Government Technology Act This bill sets forth requirements with respect to increasing the energy efficiency of information technologies and data centers within the federal government. Specifically, this bill requires each federal agency to coordinate with the Office of Management and Budget, the Department of Energy (DOE), and the Environmental Protection Agency to develop an implementation strategy for the maintenance, purchase, and use of energy-efficient and energy-saving information technologies at or for federally owned and operated facilities. DOE must (1) maintain a data center energy practitioner program that leads to the certification of energy practitioners qualified to evaluate the energy usage and efficiency opportunities in federally owned and operated data centers; and (2) establish an open data initiative to make information about federal data center energy usage available and accessible in a manner that encourages data center innovation, optimization, and consolidation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy Efficient Government Technology Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 515 (Y: 384 N: 23 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 265.
2019-10-23SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 116-145.
2019-09-25SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-09-10SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2019-09-09HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-09-09HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 23 (Roll no. 515). (text: CR H7540-7541)
2019-09-09HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7546-7547)
2019-09-09HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-09-09HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1420.
2019-09-09HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7540-7541)
2019-09-09HouseMr. Rush moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3962 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SB2137 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 263.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback