US HB1420 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 265.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 265.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth requirements with respect to increasing the energy efficiency of information technologies and data centers within the federal government. Specifically, this bill requires each federal agency to coordinate with the Office of Management and Budget, the Department of Energy (DOE), and the Environmental Protection Agency to develop an implementation strategy for the maintenance, purchase, and use of energy-efficient and energy-saving information technologies at or for federally owned and operated facilities. DOE must (1) maintain a data center energy practitioner program that leads to the certification of energy practitioners qualified to evaluate the energy usage and efficiency opportunities in federally owned and operated data centers; and (2) establish an open data initiative to make information about federal data center energy usage available and accessible in a manner that encourages data center innovation, optimization, and consolidation.
Title
Energy Efficient Government Technology Act
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 515 (Y: 384 N: 23 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 265. |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 116-145. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2019-09-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 23 (Roll no. 515). (text: CR H7540-7541) |
2019-09-09 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7546-7547) |
2019-09-09 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-09-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1420. |
2019-09-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7540-7541) |
2019-09-09 | House | Mr. Rush moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3962 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SB2137 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 263.
HB4447 (Related) 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2137 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 263.
HB4447 (Related) 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Computers and information technology
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Telephone and wireless communication
Water use and supply
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Telephone and wireless communication
Water use and supply