US HB1419 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cold War Service Medal Act This bill authorizes the military department concerned to issue the Cold War Service Medal to members of the Armed Forces who: (1) served on active duty for at least 24 consecutive months during the Cold War (September 2, 1945, through December 26, 1991), (2) were deployed outside the continental United States for at least 30 days during such period, (3) were members of a reserve component of the Armed Forces and were called or ordered to active duty to participate in exercises or operations directly related to the Cold War, or (4) performed other Cold War service as DOD may prescribe. Any such person who is already discharged or released from the Armed Forces shall be eligible only if the discharge or release was under honorable conditions.
Title
Cold War Service Medal Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Young [R-IA] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Rod Blum [R-IA] |
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
U.S. history
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1419/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1419/BILLS-115hr1419ih.pdf |