US HB1417 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Became Public Law No: 115-321.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Became Public Law No: 115-321.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Law Enforcement Museum Exhibits Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the National Law Enforcement Museum Act to permit the National Law Enforcement Museum in Washington, DC, to acquire, receive, possess, collect, ship, transport, import, and display firearms in fulfilling the museum's purposes.
Title
National Law Enforcement Museum Exhibits Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-321. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7332) |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-05-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3954) |
2018-05-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1417. |
2018-05-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3954-3955) |
2018-05-15 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 411. |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-548. |
2018-01-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-01-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Arts, culture, religion
District of Columbia
Firearms and explosives
Law enforcement officers
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
District of Columbia
Firearms and explosives
Law enforcement officers
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers