US HB1415 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-15 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-15 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
End Neglected Tropical Diseases Act This bill expands programs to address neglected tropical diseases (NTDs), which are infections caused by pathogens, including viruses, microbes, and helminths (parasitic worms), that disproportionately impact individuals living in extreme poverty, especially in developing countries. The NTDs Program of the U.S. Agency for International Development must incorporate specified priorities, including: (1) conducting monitoring and evaluation of program investments, (2) including morbidity management in treatment plans, (3) addressing additional NTDs recognized as high-burden diseases, and (4) continuing investments in research and development. The President must direct the U.S. Executive Director at the International Bank for Reconstruction and Development to urge the World Bank Institute to take actions on NTDs, including deworming programs. The Department of Health and Human Services must: (1) continue to promote the need for NTDs programs and activities through interagency groups and international forums; (2) report to Congress on NTDs in the United States; and (3) establish a panel to evaluate issues relating to worm infections, including potential solutions such as deworming medicines. The bill authorizes the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention to enter into agreements and make grants to support one or more centers of excellence for NTD research, training, and treatment.
Title
End Neglected Tropical Diseases Act
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3212 (Related) 2018-07-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Africa
Argentina
Asia
Brazil
Child health
China
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug therapy
Food assistance and relief
Foreign aid and international relief
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
India
Indonesia
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mexico
Middle East
Multilateral development programs
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Nutrition and diet
Pest management
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Saudi Arabia
South Africa
South Korea
United Nations
Water quality
Water use and supply
Women's health
World health
Africa
Argentina
Asia
Brazil
Child health
China
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug therapy
Food assistance and relief
Foreign aid and international relief
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
India
Indonesia
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mexico
Middle East
Multilateral development programs
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Nutrition and diet
Pest management
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Saudi Arabia
South Africa
South Korea
United Nations
Water quality
Water use and supply
Women's health
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1415/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1415/BILLS-115hr1415ih.pdf |