US HB1411 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transparent Summer Flounder Quotas Act This bill addresses rules governing summer flounder fisheries. As applicable to summer flounder, the rule submitted by the National Marine Fisheries Service (NMFS) titled "Fisheries of the Northeastern United States; Summer Flounder, Scup, and Black Sea Bass Fisheries; 2017-2018 Summer Flounder Specifications and Announcement of 2017 Summer Flounder and Black Sea Bass Commercial Accountability Measures" is nullified. The rule published in the Federal Register on December 22, 2016, establishes summer flounder quotas for the 2017-2018 recreational and commercial fishing seasons. The prior regulations governing summer flounder shall apply until the NMFS completes a new summer flounder stock assessment and establishes a new rule based on the stock assessment. (The prior regulations titled "Fisheries of the Northeastern United States; Summer Flounder, Scup, and Black Sea Bass Fisheries; 2016-2018 Summer Flounder, Scup, and Black Sea Bass Specifications" were published in the Federal Register on December 28, 2015, and effective as of January 1, 2016.)
Title
Transparent Summer Flounder Quotas Act
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Atlantic Ocean
Department of Commerce
Fishes
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Atlantic Ocean
Department of Commerce
Fishes
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1411/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1411/BILLS-115hr1411ih.pdf |