US HB1397 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for strategies to increase access to telehealth under the Medicaid program and Children's Health Insurance Program, and for other purposes.
Title
TIKES Act Telehealth Improvement for Kids’ Essential Services Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] |
Rep. Patrick Fallon [R-TX] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] |
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1798 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6000 (Related) 2022-01-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6000 (Related) 2022-01-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1397/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1397/BILLS-117hr1397ih.pdf |