US HB1393 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lower Rio Grande Valley Water Resources Conservation and Improvement Act of 2009 - Amends the Lower Rio Grande Valley Water Resources Conservation and Improvement Act of 2000 to authorize specified additional projects, including projects for water conservation and improvement in Cameron, Hidalgo, Willacy, Hudspeth, and El Paso counties, Texas. Permits each project that the Secretary of the Interior, acting through the Commissioner of the Bureau of Reclamation, conducts or participates in to include: (1) the replacement of irrigation canals and lateral canals with buried pipelines; (2) the impervious lining of irrigation canals and lateral canals; (3) the installation of water level, flow measurement, pump control, and telemetry systems; (4) the renovation and replacement of pumping plants; and (5) other activities that will result in water conservation or an improved water supply. Authorizes the Secretary to transfer among projects up to 10% of amounts made available for such additional projects. Authorizes appropriations for such additional projects.
Title
Lower Rio Grande Valley Water Resources Conservation and Improvement Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. | |
2009-06-03 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. | |
2009-06-02 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-06-02 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6020-6021) | |
2009-06-02 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1393. | |
2009-06-02 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6020-6021) | |
2009-06-02 | Mrs. Christensen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power. | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Pipelines
Texas
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Executive agency funding and structure
Pipelines
Texas
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply