US HB1379 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-09 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-09 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Board of Veterans' Appeals to develop evidence in appeal cases, and for other purposes. Directs the Board of Veterans' Appeals, upon determining that there is insufficient evidence to make a decision in a claimant's appeal case, to take such steps as necessary to develop the evidence needed to make a decision. Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to ensure that the Board has access to such information as may be necessary to develop such evidence. Prohibits the Board from remanding any appeal case to the Veterans Benefits Administration.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Board of Veterans' Appeals to develop evidence in appeal cases, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-09 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2015-07-09 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-04-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Evidence and witnesses
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Evidence and witnesses
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1379/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1379/BILLS-114hr1379ih.pdf |