US HB1377 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 50 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 50 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Assistant Secretary of Commerce for Communications and Information to take certain actions to enhance the representation of the United States and promote United States leadership in communications standards-setting bodies, and for other purposes.
Title
Promoting United States Wireless Leadership Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 50 - 0. |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-03-08 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 0 . |
2023-03-08 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/1377/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr1377/BILLS-118hr1377ih.pdf |