US HB1376 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Electronic Message Preservation Act of 2017 This bill requires the Archivist of the United States to promulgate regulations governing federal agency preservation of electronic messages that are federal records and to periodically review and amend, as necessary, such regulations. Such regulations, at a minimum, must: (1) require the electronic capture, management, and preservation of such electronic records in accordance with the Federal Records Act; (2) require such records to be retrievable through electronic searches; and (3) include timelines for federal agency implementation of the regulations that ensure compliance as expeditiously as practicable. The Archivist must promulgate regulations that: (1) establish mandatory minimum functional requirements for electronic records management systems and a process to ensure that such systems meet the functional requirements; and (2) include requirements for the capture, management, and preservation of other electronic records. "Electronic records management system" means software designed to manage electronic records. Federal agencies must report to the Archivist on agency compliance with the regulations and make such reports publicly available on the agency's website. The Archivist must: (1) establish standards for the management of electronic presidential records during a President's term of office, including records management controls necessary for the capture, management, and preservation of electronic messages and for ensuring that electronic messages are readily accessible for retrieval through electronic searches; (2) certify annually whether electronic records management controls established by a President meet the requirements of the Presidential Records Act; and (3) report annually on the status of such certification. The Archivist shall report to Congress one year after the conclusion of a President's term of office on: (1) the volume and format of electronic presidential records deposited into the presidential archival depository, and (2) whether electronic records management controls of a President met the requirements of this bill and the Presidential Records Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Message Preservation Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-17SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2018-07-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-16HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6199-6200)
2018-07-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1376.
2018-07-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6199-6200)
2018-07-16HouseMr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2018-07-16HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 638.
2018-07-16HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-824.
2018-03-15HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2018-03-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-03-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback