US HB1330 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior to conduct a special resource study of the site known as Amache, Camp Amache, and Granada Relocation Center, in Granada, Colorado, which was 1 of the 10 relocation centers where Japanese Americans were incarcerated during World War II. In conducting such study, Interior shall evaluate the national significance of such relocation center and determine the suitability and feasibility of designating it as a unit of the National Park System.
Title
Amache Study Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB35 (Same As) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HB2369 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HB2369 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Colorado
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Detention of persons
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Japan
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Detention of persons
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Japan
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1330/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1330/BILLS-116hr1330ih.pdf |