US HB1325 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of the Interior to issue an oil and gas leasing program under section 18 of the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act, and for other purposes.
Title
More Energy More Jobs Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB522 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
SB69 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB69 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1325/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1325/BILLS-117hr1325ih.pdf |