US HB132 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 656.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Arbuckle Project Maintenance Complex and District Office Conveyance Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of the Interior to convey to the Arbuckle Master Conservancy District in Murray County, Oklahoma, all right, title, and interest of the United States in and to the Maintenance Complex and District Office of the Arbuckle Project. The bill shields the federal government from being held liable by any court for damages arising out of any act, omission, or occurrence related to the complex and office, except for damages caused by acts of negligence by the government or government employees or agents prior to its conveyance. After such conveyance: (1) the complex and office shall not be considered to be a part of a federal reclamation project; and (2) such district shall not be eligible to receive any benefits with respect to any facility comprising such complex and office, except benefits that would be available to a similarly situated person with respect to such a facility that is not part of a federal reclamation project. If the conveyance has not been completed within 12 months, Interior shall submit to Congress an explanation and the date by which the conveyance will be completed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arbuckle Project Maintenance Complex and District Office Conveyance Act of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 159 (Y: 407 N: 1 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 656.
2018-11-15SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-369.
2018-10-02SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2018-06-13SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
2017-03-21SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2017-03-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-03-15HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 1 (Roll no. 159).
2017-03-15HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2066-2067)
2017-03-15HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-03-15HouseDEBATE - The House resumed debate on H.R. 132.
2017-03-15HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2063)
2017-03-08HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 132.
2017-03-08HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1942-1943; text of measure as introduced: CR H1942)
2017-03-08HouseMr. Webster (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
2017-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback