US HB1316 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 123-14)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a National Heritage Areas System to recognize certain areas of the United States that tell nationally significant stories and to conserve, enhance, and interpret the areas' natural, historic, scenic, and cultural resources that illustrate significant aspects of U.S. heritage, and authorizes appropriations through FY2034 for each National Heritage Area. Through such system, the Department of the Interior may provide technical and financial assistance to local coordinating entities to support the establishment, development, and continuity of such areas. The bill extends the authority for the Erie Canalway National Heritage Corridor Commission and the Gullah/Geechee Cultural Heritage Corridor Commission until September 30, 2034. The local coordinating entity of a National Heritage Area, not later than three years after the area is included in the National Heritage Area System, shall submit to Interior a management plan for approval. Interior, not later than one year before the authorization for federal funding expires for a National Heritage Area, shall (1) conduct an evaluation of the accomplishments of that area, and (2) submit a report detailing the evaluation to specified congressional committees. Based upon the evaluation, Interior shall prepare a report with recommendations for the National Park Service's continued role, if any, with respect to the area. Interior may carry out or certify a study to assess the suitability and feasibility of designating a specific geographic area as a National Heritage Area to be included in the National Heritage Area System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Heritage Area Act of 2021

Sponsors

Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]
Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2021-03-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2021-02-24HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB803 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1942 (Related) 2022-05-03 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback