US HB1313 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Transit Security Grant Program Flexibility Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transit Security Grant Program Flexibility Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-05-14HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-05-14HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3756-3757)
2019-05-14HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1313.
2019-05-14HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3756-3758)
2019-05-14HouseMs. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-03-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery.
2019-02-19HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback