US HB1310 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize additional district judgeships for the district of Colorado, and for other purposes.
Title
Colorado Judgeship Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6188 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
SB3342 (Related) 2021-12-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3342 (Related) 2021-12-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1310/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1310/BILLS-117hr1310ih.pdf |