US HB1310 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SMASH Act Strengthening Mosquito Abatement for Safety and Health Act This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to revise and extend through FY2023 Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) grants for mosquito control programs. The grant program is expanded so that grants may be used to address emerging, infectious mosquito-borne diseases and to improve existing control programs. The CDC must give preference to applicants that have: (1) a public health emergency due to a mosquito-borne disease, or (2) a control program that is consistent with existing state preparedness plans. The requirement for matching funds may be waived if the area covered by a grant applicant has an extreme need due to the size or density of the human population, the size or density of the mosquito population, or the severity of the mosquito-borne disease. CDC grants to help public health agencies improve surveillance and response activities are extended through FY2023. The Government Accountability Office must report on the surveillance and control of mosquito-borne infectious diseases in the United States and territories.
Title
SMASH Act Strengthening Mosquito Abatement for Safety and Health Act
Sponsors
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-03-02 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1490) |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB849 (Related) 2017-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6378 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate.
HB6378 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Insects
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Pest management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Insects
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Pest management
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1310/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1310/BILLS-115hr1310ih.pdf |