US HB1308 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides assistance to immigrants and addresses issues related to naturalization. The bill establishes the National Office of New Americans to (1) welcome and support immigrants, (2) promote and support immigrant integration, and (3) promote the pursuit of U.S. citizenship among immigrants. The bill also establishes grant programs for eligible entities that provide (1) legal services for immigrants, (2) English language education that focuses on integrating students into society, and (3) workforce development training that supports the economic integration of immigrants. The bill also reauthorizes the Citizenship and Integration Grant Program within U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS). USCIS shall establish a nonprofit entity to spur innovation in the expansion of citizenship preparation programs and to support assistance for immigrants seeking permanent resident status or citizenship. The bill also requires the Department of Homeland Security to (1) report to Congress before increasing fees for immigration adjudication and naturalization services above the levels of such fees on January 1, 2019, and (2) waive or reduce certain immigration-related fees for low-income aliens. The bill also (1) waives the English proficiency requirement for the naturalization of certain permanent residents, (2) repeals the public charge ground for deportation, (3) requires states to provide for automatic voter registration to qualifying new citizens unless that individual declines, and (4) sets a floor of 125,000 to the maximum number of refugees who may be admitted into the United States each year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

New Deal for New Americans Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2021-02-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
2021-02-24HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, House Administration, Foreign Affairs, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-24HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, House Administration, Foreign Affairs, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-24HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, House Administration, Foreign Affairs, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-24HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, House Administration, Foreign Affairs, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-24HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, House Administration, Foreign Affairs, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-24HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E163-164)
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB572 (Related) 2021-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB291 (Related) 2021-02-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB433 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects

Administrative remedies
Aging
Border security and unlawful immigration
Citizenship and naturalization
Civics education
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Department of Homeland Security
Domestic violence and child abuse
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Executive Office of the President
Family relationships
Foreign labor
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Language arts
Lawyers and legal services
Poverty and welfare assistance
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Right of privacy
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Teaching, teachers, curricula
User charges and fees

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback