US HB1306 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Became Public Law No: 115-103. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Western Oregon Tribal Fairness Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Western Oregon Tribal Fairness Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-103. (TXT | PDF)
2018-01-08SenateSigned by President.
2017-12-27SenatePresented to President.
2017-12-22SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2017-12-21SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8267-8269)
2017-07-12SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2017-07-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-07-11HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5412-5413)
2017-07-11HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1306.
2017-07-11HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5412-5414)
2017-07-11HouseMr. LaHood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-07-11HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 141.
2017-07-11HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-204.
2017-06-27HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2017-06-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-03-13HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
2017-03-13HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-03-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-03-02HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB508 (Same As) 2017-05-23 - Star Print ordered on report 115-65.
SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback