US HB1305 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 198.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 198.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the United States Fish and Wildlife Service (FWS) and the National Marine Fisheries Service (NMFS) to promulgate regulations to implement and enforce the Agreement on the Conservation of Albatrosses and Petrels, done at Cape Town, South Africa, on February 2, 2001. Specifically, the FWS and the NMFS may take action to protect albatrosses and petrels and their habitats. The bill prohibits the taking of an albatross or petrel without a permit, authorization, or exemption.The FWS, in consultation with the NMFS, may authorize the taking of an albatross or petrel under exceptional circumstances or incidental to otherwise lawful activities. The bill gives the FWS, the NMFS, and the Coast Guard authority to enforce this bill. Finally, the bill authorizes cooperation with other countries to achieve and maintain a favorable conservation status of albatrosses and petrels.
Title
Albatross and Petrel Conservation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 198. |
2019-10-22 | House | Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged. |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-249, Part I. |
2019-06-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 12. |
2019-06-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-19 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2019-03-26 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Animals
Aquatic ecology
Birds
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Department of the Interior
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government information and archives
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Scientific communication
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Animals
Aquatic ecology
Birds
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Department of the Interior
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government information and archives
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Scientific communication
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection