US HB1289 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-12)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Preserving Home and Office Numbers in Emergencies Act of 2019 This bill restricts the reassignment of telephone numbers during a declared major disaster. Specifically, a number may not be reassigned except at the request of the subscriber during a period in which a major disaster has been declared. The bill also allows a subscriber to cancel service without a cancellation fee and to subscribe again with the same number with no fee if the subscriber is located in a disaster area and the disaster resulted in certain types of damage to the subscriber's residence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preserving Home and Office Numbers in Emergencies Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2020-03-10HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-02-27HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
2019-02-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback