US HB1282 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-7)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Horse Transportation Safety Act of 2015 Prohibits a person from transporting a horse in interstate commerce in a motor vehicle (except a vehicle operated exclusively on rail or rails) containing two or more levels stacked on top of one another. Prescribes civil penalties for persons who knowingly violate such prohibition.
Title
Horse Transportation Safety Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2015-03-04 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E310) |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB850 (Same As) 2015-03-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB946 (Related) 2015-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB946 (Related) 2015-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Animals
Civil actions and liability
Mammals
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Transportation safety and security
Animals
Civil actions and liability
Mammals
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1282/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1282/BILLS-114hr1282ih.pdf |