US HB128 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Workforce Protections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Workforce Protections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Worksite Reporting Act Directs the Secretary of Labor to revise certain regulations under the Occupational Safety and Health Act of 1970 so as to require site-controlling employers to keep a site log for all recordable injuries and illnesses occurring among all employees on the particular site, whether such employees are employed directly by the site-controlling employer or are employed by contractors or temporary help or employee leasing services.
Title
Worksite Reporting Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections. |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2090 (Related) 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
SB1112 (Related) 2015-04-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2477-2478)
SB1112 (Related) 2015-04-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2477-2478)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Business records
Contracts and agency
Department of Labor
Government information and archives
Labor and employment
Labor standards
Worker safety and health
Business records
Contracts and agency
Department of Labor
Government information and archives
Labor and employment
Labor standards
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/128/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr128/BILLS-114hr128ih.pdf |