US HB1276 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian and Insular Affairs .
Pending: House Indian and Insular Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To protect children from medical malpractice in the form of gender transition procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect Minors from Medical Malpractice Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian and Insular Affairs .
2023-03-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2023-03-01HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2023-03-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB635 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback