US HB1276 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to furnish COVID–19 vaccines to certain individuals, and for other purposes.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs Veterans’ and Caregivers’ COVID–19 Immunizations Now Expanded Act of 2021 VA VACCINE Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-03-24 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-4. |
2021-03-24 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-03-23 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-03-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-03-19 | House | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H1603) |
2021-03-19 | House | Mr. Takano asked unanimous consent to take the bill, H.R. 1276, from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H1603) |
2021-03-19 | House | Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H1603) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1620) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.1400 Amendment SA 1400 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.1400 Amendment SA 1400 proposed by Senator Padilla for Senator Tester. (consideration: CR S1620; text: CR S1620) In the nature of a substitute. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1620) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-03-09 | House | On passage Passed without objection. |
2021-03-09 | House | H.Amdt.27 On agreeing to the Takano amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2021-03-09 | House | H.Amdt.27 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Takano. (consideration: CR H1178; text: CR H1178) |
2021-03-09 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1178; text: CR H1178) |
2021-03-09 | House | Mr. Takano asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB682 (Related) 2021-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.